AZ HB2454 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Statutory conformity; property tax exemptions
Title
Statutory conformity; property tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-5-2-1) |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Education - Title 15
Property Tax Exemptions
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Education - Title 15
Property Tax Exemptions
Statutory Conformity
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |