AZ HB2452 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Senate Consent Calendar April 21, 2010 @ 5:20 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Senate Consent Calendar April 21, 2010 @ 5:20 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; towns; urbanized areas; incorporation
Title
Cities; towns; urbanized areas; incorporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Senate Consent Calendar April 21, 2010 @ 5:20 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (50-4-6-0) | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-03-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |