AZ HB2441 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate third reading , voting: (3-27-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Senate third reading , voting: (3-27-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; declaration amendments
Title
Homeowners' associations; declaration amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate third reading , voting: (3-27-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House third reading , voting: (44-14-2-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-14 | House Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 12:31 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |