AZ HB2440 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
VLT exemption; veteran amputees
Title
VLT exemption; veteran amputees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-2-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |