AZ HB2432 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1012
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community colleges; lease-purchase agreements; indebtedness.
Title
Community colleges; lease-purchase agreements; indebtedness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Replaced by) 2021-02-26 - Chapter 38
Subjects
Community College District Boards
Community Colleges
Education - Title 15
Indebtedness
Lease-purchase Agreements
Community Colleges
Education - Title 15
Indebtedness
Lease-purchase Agreements