AZ HB2422 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Coordinated reentry planning services programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coordinated reentry planning services programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73084
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2422p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2422h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2422payne.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2422public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2422cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2422appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73084&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73084&billStatusActionId=194108&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73084&billStatusActionId=194163&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback