AZ HB2422 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local government budgeting; posting; publication
Title
Local government budgeting; posting; publication
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Ted Vogt [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-25 | House read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in House and read first time |