AZ HB2418 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protected data; motor vehicle dealers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protected data; motor vehicle dealers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateChapter 52
2019-04-09SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-02HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-03-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-20HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71548
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2418p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2418h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2418s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0052.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2418campbell.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2418transportation.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2418livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2418tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2418livingston0933.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71548&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71548&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71548&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=187169&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188046&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188165&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71548&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71548&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188701&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188708&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188754&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71548&billStatusActionId=188756&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback