AZ HB2413 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile court; dispositions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court; dispositions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8349Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73075
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2413p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2413h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2413allen j.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2413judiciary.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73075&billStatusActionId=193564&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73075&billStatusActionId=193693&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback