AZ HB2412 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration records; petition submittals
Title
Voter registration records; petition submittals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 126 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | House concurs |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-28 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |