AZ HB2409 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adult protective services; audit; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult protective services; audit; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-1-0)
2021-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-10HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-08HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74947
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2409p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2409h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483082
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483411
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484139
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484598
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486529
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74947&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74947&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74947&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74947&billStatusActionId=201723&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74947&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback