AZ HB2402 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; test results; letter classification
Title
Schools; test results; letter classification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Motion HB 2402 substituted for SB 1178. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Motion HB 2402 substituted for SB 1178. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Chapter 19 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2402 substituted for SB 1178. Motion carried. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Replaces) 2021-02-04 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended