AZ HB2399 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Waste tires; definitions
Title
Waste tires; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 201 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-20 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-9-2-0) |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-16-1-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |