AZ HB2397 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Spirituous liquors; alternating proprietorships

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spirituous liquors; alternating proprietorships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2020-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4243.03New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73058
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2397p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2397h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2397weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2397commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73058&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73058&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73058&billStatusActionId=193560&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73058&billStatusActionId=193701&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback