AZ HB2384 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Unlawful flight; vehicle impoundment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful flight; vehicle impoundment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 303
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2018-04-04SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2018-04-03SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
284834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28622.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70216
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2384p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2384h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0303.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2384farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2384judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=180877&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=181305&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=181306&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70216&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=182546&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=182885&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=182938&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70216&billStatusActionId=183776&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback