AZ HB2381 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of tourism; powers; fund
Title
Office of tourism; powers; fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 280 |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-01 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (33-18-9-0) |
2022-06-01 | House | House concurs |
2022-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-25 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-1-5-0) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Fund
Office Of Tourism
Powers
Sports Facilities Account
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction
Tourism
Tourism Development Fund (s)
Fund
Office Of Tourism
Powers
Sports Facilities Account
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction
Tourism
Tourism Development Fund (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 2305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2307 | New Code | See Bill Text |