AZ HB2379 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hotel; motel; vouchers; homeless; prohibition
Title
Hotel; motel; vouchers; homeless; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gress [R] | Rep. John Gillette [R] | Rep. Justin Heap [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-04-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-01 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 269.27 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 500.49 | New Code | See Bill Text |