AZ HB2378 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ranked choice voting; presidential preference
Title
Ranked choice voting; presidential preference
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |