AZ HB2376 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Class 2 property; guest ranches
Title
Class 2 property; guest ranches
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. David Cook [R] | Sen. Jake Hoffman [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 185 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-3-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-13-2-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |