AZ HB2370 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sovereign authority; refugees
Title
Sovereign authority; refugees
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |