AZ HB2367 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration department; reporting; public debt
Title
Administration department; reporting; public debt
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Lovas [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 156 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Department Of Administration
Government Information Technology
Governor
President Of The Senate
Public Finances
Speaker Of The House Of Representatives
Government Information Technology
Governor
President Of The Senate
Public Finances
Speaker Of The House Of Representatives
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 304 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |