AZ HB2366 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle accidents; restricted license
Title
Motor vehicle accidents; restricted license
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] |
Rep. Tony Rivero [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 153 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |