AZ HB2357 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
EORP; employer contributions
Title
EORP; employer contributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-02-12 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (21-37-1-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House BI Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |