AZ HB2353 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; dangerous offenses; probation
Title
Sentencing; dangerous offenses; probation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-07 | House final reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-14 | House Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 12:31 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-03 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |