AZ HB2351 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate; employee; rent collection
Title
Real estate; employee; rent collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |