AZ HB2346 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outpatient treatment centers; exemption
Title
Outpatient treatment centers; exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Amish Shah [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 89 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-13 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurs |
2023-04-11 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2023-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0) |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-06 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Exemption
Health Care Institution (s)
Health Care Institutions
Outpatient Treatment Centers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Health Care Institution (s)
Health Care Institutions
Outpatient Treatment Centers
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 439 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |