AZ HB2345 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Weights and measures department; continuation
Title
Weights and measures department; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-25 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-25 | House | House final reading , voting: (51-1-8-0) |
2013-04-25 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |