AZ HB2333 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred to Senate CWD Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - Referred to Senate CWD Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of technical registration; exemptions
Title
Board of technical registration; exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |