AZ HB2328 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Procurement from certain agencies
Title
Procurement from certain agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-26 | House final reading , voting: (51-6-3-0) | |
2010-04-26 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-20 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | House third reading , voting: (53-4-2-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |