AZ HB2319 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
HURF transfers; highway patrol; repeal
Title
HURF transfers; highway patrol; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 6537 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6538 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |