AZ HB2316 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Misconduct involving weapons; public places
Title
Misconduct involving weapons; public places
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |