AZ HB2310 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

School procurement; lowest bidder; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School procurement; lowest bidder; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-28HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-24HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-01-24HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15213.04Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71422
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2310p.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2310cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2310cobb2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2310cobb3.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71422&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71422&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71422&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71422&billStatusActionId=188139&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback