AZ HB2305 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - House RULES Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicle occupants; evidence of identity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle occupants; evidence of identity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-01HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-24HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-23HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
281595Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback