AZ HB2304 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State elections; omnibus
Title
State elections; omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] |
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (59-1-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | House third reading , voting: (51-5-4-0) | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |