AZ HB2302 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Protected address; secretary of state
Title
Protected address; secretary of state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | House final reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-11 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-0-3-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-21 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |