AZ HB2296 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona health education centers; increase
Title
Arizona health education centers; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-4-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Board Of Regents
Board Of Regents
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Education - Title 15
Board Of Regents
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Education - Title 15