AZ HB2292 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education qualifications; barber licenses
Title
Education qualifications; barber licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 188 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |