AZ HB2283 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Definition; defenses; sexual offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definition; defenses; sexual offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateChapter 266
2018-04-25SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-12HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse JPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
131407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133560Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70045
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2283p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2283h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2283s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0266.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2283kern.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2283judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.22831202.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2283jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2283burges0350.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70045&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70045&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=181253&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=181295&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70045&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70045&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=183006&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=183099&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=183321&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70045&billStatusActionId=183326&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback