AZ HB2272 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chapter 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; secondary sources
Title
Insurance; secondary sources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 89 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |