AZ HB2265 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Title
Lieutenant governor; duties; ballot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Not Heard |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-26-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-0-1-0) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |