AZ HB2258 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County contributions; hospitalization; medical; repeal
Title
County contributions; hospitalization; medical; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-2-0) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-2-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |