AZ HB2244 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dangerous crimes; children; fictitious age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dangerous crimes; children; fictitious age

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateChapter 181
2018-04-11SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-03HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-31HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-16HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411604.11Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411604.13Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69988
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2244p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2244h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2244s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0181.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2244burges0307.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69988&billStatusActionId=180561&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69988&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69988&billStatusActionId=182451&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69988&billStatusActionId=182796&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69988&billStatusActionId=183051&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69988&billStatusActionId=183069&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback