AZ HB2236 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Theft by extortion; tax liens
Title
Theft by extortion; tax liens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-26 | House final reading , voting: (55-1-4-0) | |
2010-04-26 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-20 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |