AZ HB2232 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Information technology authorization committee; membership
Title
Information technology authorization committee; membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |