AZ HB2230 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
High schools; college accessibility awareness
Title
High schools; college accessibility awareness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |