AZ HB2227 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Legislators; mileage rate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislators; mileage rate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 321
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-08HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0)
2017-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0)
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-26HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68750
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2227p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2227h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0321.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68750&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68750&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68750&billStatusActionId=174560&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68750&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68750&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68750&billStatusActionId=177475&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback