AZ HB2225 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Speech-language pathologists; assistants
Title
Speech-language pathologists; assistants
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1910 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1925 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1940.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |