AZ HB2222 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cotton research council; continuation
Title
Cotton research council; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Chapter 32 | |
2014-04-15 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate NRRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-11 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-4-1-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House AW Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House AW Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |