AZ HB2213 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Child custody; technical correction
Title
Child custody; technical correction
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Ash [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-06 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 1:35 PM | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | House third reading , voting: (55-4-1-0) | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-03 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-03 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-03 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-1-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |