AZ HB2211 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bankruptcy exemption; personal property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bankruptcy exemption; personal property

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateChapter 200
2018-04-12SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69974
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2211p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2211h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0200.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2211thorpe.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2211federalism property rights and public policy.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2211dalessandro0130.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69974&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69974&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69974&billStatusActionId=180922&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69974&billStatusActionId=181319&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69974&billStatusActionId=181338&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69974&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69974&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69974&billStatusActionId=182818&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69974&billStatusActionId=183012&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback